Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mark Welt, Mary Welt, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Collins, John Albert, Scime, James Thomas, Wischerath, Melissa Dorothy, against Ann Mattioli, Richard Mattioli D B A Clinton Auto Repair, Richard Mattioli D B A Clinton Auto Repair, Wing Enterprises, Incorporated D B A Little Giant Solutions, Wing Enterprises, Incorporated D B A Little Giant Solutions, (total of 5) See All represented by Eagan, James Edward, Johnson, Neal A, Poveromo, Richard Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Catherine R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 12, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 20, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 25, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 26, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 27, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 16, 2022STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 23, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: March 23, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 15, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 05, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Against Defendants Richard Mattioli d/b/a Clinton Auto & Ann Matioli Only |
||
March 23, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
May 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Notice of Appeal |
||
May 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
April 27, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) of Order re: summary judgment |
||
April 26, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 26, 2022 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED | ||
April 26, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
April 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003) Photo of ladder |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.