Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Daniel Jones, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Child Support Enforcement, Erie County Department Of Social Services, represented by Kirby, Kenneth Ralph, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Ejeannette Ogden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEjeannette Ogden Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Child Support) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeChild Support |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Order of Disposition, judgments, and related items
Date: January 28, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
May 05, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
May 05, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS February 9, 2021 |
||
April 11, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
April 11, 2023 | APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) | ||
March 07, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
February 21, 2023 | APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) | ||
September 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
September 02, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #008) Notice of Entry of Order and Judgment Dismissing Article 78 Petition, along with copy of said Order Notice of Entry of Order and Judgment Dismissing Article 78 Petition, along with copy of said Order ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.