Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G. Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G. Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time348 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Hon. Maria G. Rosa STIP DISCONTINUANCE (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
January 22, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 01/22/2016Closed Before Justice: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
January 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Hon. Maria G. Rosa - Motions Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
December 03, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 12/03/2015Closed Before Justice: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
December 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Hon. Maria G. Rosa - Motions Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
December 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa 9:45 CC/MOTION, ERENCE (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
September 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Hon. Maria G. Rosa Supreme Trial, 9:45 SETT CONF (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
July 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa 9:45 SETT CONF (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
June 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
May 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.