Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with James V. Brands presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames V. Brands Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2017 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time736 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled James V. Brands CALENDAR CONTROL-SUR, PLUS MONIES FORM (Conversion) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned James V. Brands CALENDAR CONTROL-SUR, PLUS MONIES FORM (Conversion) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
October 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned James V. Brands CALENDAR CONTROL-SUR, PLUS MONIES FORM (Conversion) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
March 01, 2016 | Hearing |
James V. Brands
Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
February 22, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 03/01/2016Closed Before Justice: Brands, Hon. James V. Answer demanded: No Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
February 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) James V. Brands (Motion Part) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
February 22, 2016 | Hearing |
James V. Brands MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
August 25, 2015 | Motion |
Order of Reference/Referee to Compute (Motion #002) Decided: 09/01/2015Closed Before Justice: Brands, Hon. James V. Answer demanded: No Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
August 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) James V. Brands (Motion Part) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
|
August 25, 2015 | Hearing |
James V. Brands MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Brands, Hon. James V. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.