Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Charles Salomon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patsos, Christopher J, against Utica National Insurance Group, Mico Cooling Corporaton, Copart, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service OTSC Respondent Mico |
||
February 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service OTSC on Respondent COPART |
||
January 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service OTSC on Respondent, Utica National Ins.Co |
||
January 24, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Attorney Affirmation In Support of OTSC |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Police Report |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B |
||
January 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation In Good Faith |
||
January 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.