Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Karen P Stewart, Northern Dutchess Bible Church, filed a(n) Dissolution - Commercial case represented by Vecchio, Philip Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Certificate Of Incorporation/Dissolution |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeDissolution |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 14, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Letter seeking clarification. |
||
December 14, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Poughkeepsie Journal Affidavit of Publication |
||
November 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #2) Notice of Petition |
||
November 03, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 02, 2022 |
EXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order for Dissolution under NYS RCL Section 18 |
||
October 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Constitution approved April 27, 2003 |
||
October 31, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected* Dissolution of Religious Corporation under Section 18 of the Religious Corporation Law |
||
October 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Certificate of Amendment to Certificate of Incorporation dated November 19, 1999 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.