Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barbara Blumberg, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Weber, Richard Lewis, against Sweet'S Funeral Home, Inc., Tina M. Turner And, represented by Rappleyea, Allan B, Vananden, Colleen Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Christi J Acker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristi J Acker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Declaratory Judgment) |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
June 30, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery Demands |
||
June 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Responsive statements |
||
June 30, 2023 |
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Prelimin Conf Stip and Order |
||
May 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 19, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 18, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
May 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 18, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.