Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Thomas E. Stolz As Administrator Of The Goods Chattels And Credits Which Were Of Michael P. Stolz, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gordon, Alvin Craig, Gordon, Ava Melissa, Moses, Manuel B, against Candace Susan Crutchfield As Administratrix Of The Goods, Chattels And Credits Which Were Of Craig Michael Shannon, Michael B. Shannon Md, Vassar Brothers Hospital D B A Vassar Brothers Medical Center, represented by Bennice, Jennifer Joan, Burgess, Craig Aron, Dedonato, Joseph, Gallo, Vincent L, Kealy, Edward Francis, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Edward Mcloughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward Mcloughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Dutchess. The plaintiff, Thomas E. Stolz, as the administrator of the estate of Michael P. Stolz, is suing the defendants, Michael B. Shannon, MD, Canda...
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT of Service |
||
May 09, 2023 | Notice of Entry | ||
May 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 05, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER *Corrected* Order Dismissing Complaint with Prejudice |
||
April 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER | ||
February 21, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Corrected Containing Order |
||
February 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Supplemental attorney affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.