Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jacob Rosado, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cohn, Mikael Ari, against Dejuan Koonce, represented by Rubinstein, Heather Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED | ||
August 16, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
August 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
August 16, 2023 | Affidavit of Medicare Eligibility | ||
August 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 04, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 26, 2023 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
July 26, 2023 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Dr.Wiener CV |
||
March 09, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.