Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Travis T. Angelo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Klein, Steven Howard, against Amanda M. Angelo, represented by Kranis, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Tracy C Mackenzie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy C Mackenzie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 22, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
October 22, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) | ||
October 21, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) | ||
October 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
October 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | COMPLAINT AMENDED | ||
October 01, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
September 30, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 30, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.