Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chandrika Patel, Dahyabhai Patel, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Stone, Paul D, against Town Of Rhinebeck, represented by Replansky, Warren Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Christi J Acker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristi J Acker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 01, 2021PETITION
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 22, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Decision and Order in Creed-Monarch v. Town of Rhinebeck |
||
November 18, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
November 18, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Letter by Town dated 7/26/21 |
||
November 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Letter to Town dated 7/19/21 |
||
November 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.