Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Maximo Aponte, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Raiche, Raymond Peter, against Kelly Campbell-Aponte, represented by Jones, Brett E., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey C Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey C Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 12, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
April 25, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL | ||
April 20, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
April 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 20, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
April 10, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
April 06, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
April 05, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 05, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.