Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Justin G. Murphy, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Breslow, Lawrence Andrew, against Jj Equity Holdings, Llc, Manchester Mart, Inc., represented by Lindy, Joshua David, Stafford, Daniel Cade, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Michael G Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G Hayes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 19, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 19, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
March 29, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 22, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 15, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 10, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
March 09, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.