Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Julie Raylor, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 12, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 07, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
||
November 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 07, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 10/7/21 |
||
September 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 26, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.