Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jason L Dorn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Redder, George W., against Gretchen L Dorn, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Michael G Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G Hayes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 12, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
October 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
September 10, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 02, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
September 02, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
September 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2021 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | ||
September 02, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
September 02, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.