Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Antonio L Moreno, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
||
December 30, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 30, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 08, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
October 07, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 10/7/21 |
||
September 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.