Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Richard A Baratta, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Obtain Birth Certificate) case represented by Cantor, Richard Ivan, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Christi J Acker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristi J Acker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Obtain Birth Certificate) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
|
RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 15, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 15, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 24, 2021ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: June 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 14, 2021PETITION *Corrected*
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 21, 2021 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
June 15, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Birth Certificate |
||
June 15, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause dated June 7, 2021 |
||
June 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CERTIFICATION OF DEATH DATED AUGUST 3, 1993 Redacted per 22 NYCRR CERTIFICATION OF DEATH DATED AUGUST 3, 1993 Redacted |
||
June 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B REQUIREMENTS - MAIL IN APPLICATION FOR BIRTH CERTIFICATE |
||
June 14, 2021 |
PETITION *Corrected* Petition dated June 7, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.