Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Quiana Lowe, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Jasa 20 Noxon Street Llc, represented by Bergin, Scott D., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 21, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 02, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 25, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 03, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 21, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Maria G. Rosa re: matter settled |
||
July 19, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
||
February 03, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Proposed dates for Adjournment of Conference of 02/07/2023 |
||
February 03, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 03, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting Adjournment of Conference of 02/07/2023 |
||
December 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 02, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
May 23, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
May 20, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.