Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Amanda Matthews, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: June 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
||
October 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 11, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 30, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 6/30/21 |
||
June 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 28, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.