Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Preston Stoner, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Metzger, Mark J., against Sidney Levinson, Tess Levinson, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas R Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas R Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 23, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: November 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 15, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 09, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 12, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 03, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 26, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 03, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 01, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 29, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 26, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2022DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE
Date: January 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
November 30, 2022 | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
November 29, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 15, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Chambers of Judge Christie L. D'Alessio, J.S.C. |
||
November 09, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court - Request for Adjournment |
||
November 09, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 29, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 23, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Post Deposition Demand for Discovery and Inspection, dated May 20, 2022 |
||
May 02, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.