Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mgd-11 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dowd, Michael G., Sweeney, Gerard J., against Trinity-Pawling School, And The Board Of Trustees Of Trinity-Pawling School, Trinity-Pawling School Corporation, represented by Daniels, David E., Lusardi, Robert C., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 20, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
November 03, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DISCOVERY |
||
August 09, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DUE DATE EXTENSION |
||
June 03, 2022 | ORDER - AMENDED | ||
June 01, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
May 31, 2022 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Sodexo's Answer to Amended Third-Party Complaint |
||
May 31, 2022 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Marriott's Answer to Amended Third-Party Complaint |
||
May 27, 2022 |
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Amended Third-Party Summons and Amended Third-Party Complaint |
||
May 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.