Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Richard Von Der Lieth, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Carlini, Anthony Carlos, against Barbara Giordano A K A Barbara Leonaggeo A K A Barbara Giordano-Leonaggeo, Catania, Mahon, Milligram & Rider, Pllc, H&L Equine, Llc, Jack Giordano, Jane Doe 1-10, (total of 11) See All represented by Ealy, David H., Hagstrom, Karen E, Stenger, Kenneth M., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 10, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #7) Response to Motion of Defendant M-M2 RE Holdings 4, LLC, to Confirm Report of Sale and Direct Paymen Response to Motion of Defendant M-M2 RE Holdings 4, LLC, to Confirm Report of Sale and Direct Paymen ... show more |
||
February 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) judgment of foreclosure |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #7) letter |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #7) referee deed 11.4.22 |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #7) referee report of sale |
||
February 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) deed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.