Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jane Doe - 19240, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Milbauer, Seth, against County Of Dutchess, The Children'S Home Of Poughkeepsie, represented by Gasparini, Louis U, Loftus, Carolyn Ann, Pitcoff, Kenneth E, Rosedale, Rebecca June, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DUE DATE EXTENSION |
||
January 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE including post - ebt demand |
||
November 23, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DUE DATE EXTENSION |
||
November 10, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF INSURANCE AGREEMENTS |
||
November 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 09, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER CPLR 3216 ORDER - CERTIFICATION |
||
August 04, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 19, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.