Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Miguel Dejesus, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
||
August 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 11, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
August 11, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor | ||
August 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
August 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
March 04, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/4/21 |
||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 22, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.