Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Akarah, Amanie, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Grubea, Jessica Joy, Polowy, Amy E., Szczepanski, William Edward, (total of 5) See All against Discover Bank, John Doe, Nancy Muscietta Aka Nancy N Muscietta, Victor J. Muscietta, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Dutchess County Supreme Court with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseDutchess County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 06, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AOS FOR DISCOVER BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.