Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Renata Coleman, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rappleyea, Allan B, against Assessor, Board Of Assessment Review, Town Of Clinton, A Municipal Corporation, represented by Egan, Shane Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with James Brands presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Brands Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Case Cycle Time170 days |
This complaint is an application for the review of the assessment of certain real property under Article 7 of the Real Property Tax Law. The petitioner, Renata Coleman, alleges that the assessments of her property by the Town of Clinton, its Assessor...
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. James V. Brands, J.H.O. on January 10, 2020. |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. James V. Brands, J.H.O. on January 10, 2020. |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.