Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
David Aranovsky, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Burns, James, against Hancock Town Of, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Joshua S Shapiro presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoshua S Shapiro Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property - Scar |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 26, 2022SCAR -DECISION
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: January 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 26, 2022 | SCAR -DECISION | ||
January 21, 2022 |
NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) Returned Mail (SCAR Hearing Notice) - David Aranovsky |
||
January 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A FNMA Appraisal |
||
January 07, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 29, 2021 | SCAR PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.