Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jeanmichel Rene Letennier, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ksenia Kravtsova, represented by Domingue-Hendrickson, Cindy Marie, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 05, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
November 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
November 04, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
October 27, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
October 25, 2021 | ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE | ||
October 25, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 12, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 12, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.