Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Altman, Annette T, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Paul E Harrington Jr, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts Delaware County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseDelaware County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
March 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.