Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Altman, Annette T, Jordan, Tarah Eve, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Mindy Demoney, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Richard D Northrup presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard D Northrup Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions361 days |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time741 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 02, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 10, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 03, 2019 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 03, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
||
July 03, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
||
July 03, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 24, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
June 11, 2019 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED NORTHRUP, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: RICHARD D. NORTHRUP, JR. |
|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NORTHRUP, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD D. NORTHRUP, JR. |
|
May 17, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) NORTHRUP, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD D. NORTHRUP, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.