Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jaber, Ammar Samir, Montero, Christhie Maria, Risalvato, Anthony Joseph, Sposato, Melissa A., against Amy Mcdonnell Heir At Law And Next Of Kin, Delaware County Department Of Social Services, Dorothy Mcdonnell Heir At Law And Next Of Kin, Erin Mcdonnell Heir At Law And Next Of Kin, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, (total of 7) See All represented by Rase, Daniel Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: January 08, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 19, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 17, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 04, 2023 |
ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #4) Order of Reference signed by Judge Burns on 12/22/2022 |
||
November 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) GAL documents |
||
November 04, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) 90 Day Redacted per 22 NYCRR 90 Day Redacted |
||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR Mortgage Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.