Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cfcu Community Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lapp, Stephen, against Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, John Doe, Kay Harvey, Kay Lynn Harvey A K A Kay Harvey, Midland Funding Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing - Adj. Settlement Conf. | ||
January 31, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
December 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 08, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
December 06, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 06, 2022 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 06, 2022 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ KAY LYNN HARVEY AKA KAY HARVEY |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF 3215 MAILING / KAY LYNN HARVEY AKA KAY HARVEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.