Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Howard Leonard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Walsh, Ronald Thomas, against Janet E Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
August 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 23, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
August 17, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
August 08, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
July 29, 2022 | SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE | ||
July 29, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.