Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Matthew K Mcintyre, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
November 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
November 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
November 13, 2023 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT AND ORDER |
||
September 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 08, 2023 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
August 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) w court notice |
||
August 14, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 11, 2023 | ASSIGNED RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.