Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mariner Finance Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Connie Stevens, Kevin Allen, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
August 31, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVIC - KEVIN ALLEN | ||
August 22, 2022 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
August 17, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 22, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.