Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Anna M Fox, Yvonne Fox, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 12, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: August 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
August 08, 2022 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
August 05, 2022 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
August 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 12, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.