Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Romain Safraz Sankar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ahmed, Usman, against Bibi Narifa Edun, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 08, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
June 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 29, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
June 29, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
May 05, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
May 04, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
May 04, 2022 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
May 04, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
May 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.