Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Dustin J Alguard, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 02, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: April 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 25, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
April 20, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 20, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 09, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.