Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kenneth A Brafman, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case against Cortland County Sheriff, Mark E Helms, Of Cortland County, represented by Monty, Victoria J, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 04, 2022PETITION
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
July 22, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
July 22, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
June 20, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Sealed |
||
June 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Sealed |
||
June 20, 2022 |
ANSWER Sealed |
||
May 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Sealed |
||
May 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Sealed |
||
May 13, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Sealed |
||
April 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.