Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Heather J Orr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cohen, Lauren S., against Justin L Orr, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 19, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
April 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 15, 2022 | REGISTRY CHECK RESULTS | ||
February 15, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
February 14, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
February 14, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
February 14, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
February 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.