Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rasmussen, David Lee, against Jessica C Amidon, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 11, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 16, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REJECTION LETTER |
||
June 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 11, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
February 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - JESSICA C. AMIDON |
||
February 01, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.