Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sarita Ramnauth Gowkarran, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Mahendra Singh Gowkarran, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 26, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
July 09, 2020 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
July 07, 2020 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
July 07, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
July 07, 2020 | SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.