Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Maria Errico, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Centeno, David, against David Cortes, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 26, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
August 28, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 24, 2020 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
July 23, 2020 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
July 23, 2020 |
COMPLAINT Verified Complaint |
||
July 23, 2020 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
July 23, 2020 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.