Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Bridget Emeigh A K A Bridgett Emeigh, Bridgett Emeigh, Bridgett Emeigh A K A, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 13, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions275 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time275 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 13, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: May 15, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: August 28, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 15, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 15, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
May 15, 2019 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 15, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
May 15, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
May 15, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
May 15, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 10, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
May 10, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.