Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Aaron Bickal A K A Aaron S. Bickal A K A Aaron Samuel Bickal, Capital One Bank, John Doe Said Name Being Fictitious It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein And Any Parties Corporations Or Entities If Any Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Sherri Bickal A K A Sherri M. Bickal A K A Sherri Marie Bickal, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip R Rumsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip R Rumsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management331 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time153 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #2X)
Date: May 16, 2016JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 31, 2016ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: May 24, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
November 25, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
November 07, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 07, 2016 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
September 21, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 21, 2016 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Referee's Report of Sale and Terms of Sale |
||
May 31, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
May 31, 2016 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
May 31, 2016 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
May 25, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.