Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, Kleiman, Howard, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Town Of Cincinnatus, William Tobias A K A William E. Tobias, represented by Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Ferris D. Lebous presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFerris D. Lebous Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions576 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time576 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 14, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 20, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: September 29, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 07, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 22, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 20, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 01, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 22, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: February 25, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 22, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 08, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 14, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2015NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 20, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2015ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: April 19, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 14, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 03, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2017 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry with Order Nunc Pro Tunc |
||
August 03, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service of NOE |
||
August 01, 2017 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 31, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) LEBOUS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. FERRIS D. LEBOUS |
|
July 31, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT RESTORATION LEBOUS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. FERRIS D. LEBOUS |
|
July 28, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #003) LEBOUS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. FERRIS D. LEBOUS |
|
June 21, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service and "corrected" Notice of Motion with new return date and change of venue |
||
June 20, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation |
||
June 20, 2017 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order Nunc Pro Tunc |
||
June 20, 2017 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.