Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gerald Gray, Mary Ellen Gray, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Friedlander, William S, against D B A Teribury Construction, Nbt Bancorp Inc., Roland Teribury Sr, represented by Lewis, Lori B, Liptak, Thomas E, Owens, Susan B, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip R Rumsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip R Rumsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time538 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 06, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 10, 2016 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 10, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
November 02, 2015 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT So Ordered Discovery Order |
||
September 10, 2015 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 10, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
August 24, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
August 06, 2015 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference |
||
July 17, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
July 13, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.