Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Polowy, Amy E., Vogt, Megan Caroline, Young, Keith Richard, (total of 5) See All against Amber Vandee, John Doe, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, Shawn Oliver, represented by Walls, Michele M, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions449 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time449 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 03, 2015EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2017 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 06, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
April 06, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
April 06, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT RESTORATION CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
April 05, 2017 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
April 05, 2017 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
April 05, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) copy of the Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR copy of the Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted |
||
April 05, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Copy of the order of reference Redacted per 22 NYCRR Copy of the order of reference Redacted |
||
April 05, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) refiled notice of pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR refiled notice of pendency Redacted |
||
April 05, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notice of appearance and answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of appearance and answer Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.