Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, Komosinski, Richard F, Manfro, Jordan Jayce, against Aqua Finance, Inc., Chesapeake Appalachia Llc, Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Michael J. Fisher A K A Michael Fisher, (total of 6) See All represented by Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with William F Ames presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F Ames Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions289 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time289 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 12, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: November 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2016 | Hearing |
AMES (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. WILLIAM F. AMES |
|
April 27, 2016 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
March 10, 2016 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
February 23, 2016 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 13, 2015 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 13, 2015 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
November 13, 2015 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
November 13, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT AMES (Court Activity) Judge: HON. WILLIAM F. AMES |
|
November 12, 2015 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 12, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.