Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crown Center For Nursing And Rehabilitation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Haran, Brian James, Kern, Kenneth Michael, against Cheryl Durgala, Jack Durgala, represented by Jones, Robert Richard, Terrell, Joshua T., in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1032 days |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1813 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 16, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 05, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 08, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference scheduled on January 5, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. |
||
December 07, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 06, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Judicial Re-assignment notices |
||
January 02, 2020 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE MASLER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARK G. MASLER |
|
November 16, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE GUY (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. MARK G. MASLER |
|
November 14, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-BANKRUPTCY DEFENDANT MASLER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARK G. MASLER |
|
October 16, 2017 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 16, 2017 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.